Hon Andrew LEUNG Kwan-yuen, GBM, GBS, JP |
Category of registrable interests | Date of registration | ||
1. | Remunerated Directorships
| 07.10.2016
08.03.2017 13.12.2017 21.12.2017 21.12.2017 21.12.2017 07.05.2018 28.05.2018* 17.12.2020 27.01.2021 09.02.2021 | |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc.
| 07.10.2016
02.05.2018 | |
3. | Clients (arising from or relating in any manner to the membership of the Council)
| 07.10.2016
| |
4. | Election Donations / Financial Sponsorships | ||
(1) | Election donations
| 07.10.2016
25.10.2016* | |
(2) | Financial sponsorships
| 07.10.2016
| |
5. | Overseas Visits
| 07.10.2016
| |
6. | Payments, benefits or advantages received from any government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" | ||
(1) | From any government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong
| 07.10.2016
| |
(2) | From any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident"
| 07.10.2016
| |
7. | Land and Property
| 07.10.2016
| |
8. | Beneficial interests in shares of companies or other bodies
| 07.10.2016
19.10.2016 09.12.2016 26.01.2017 11.05.2017 27.01.2021 | |
9. | Miscellaneous
| 07.10.2016
17.10.2016 09.12.2016* |