Ir Dr Hon LO Wai-kwok, GBS, MH, JP |
Category of registrable interests | Date of registration | ||
1. | Remunerated Directorships
| 11.10.2016
23.12.2016 01.03.2019 25.06.2019 05.10.2020 05.10.2020 | |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc.
| 11.10.2016
| |
3. | Clients (arising from or relating in any manner to the membership of the Council)
| 11.10.2016
| |
4. | Election Donations / Financial Sponsorships | ||
(1) | Election donations
| 11.10.2016
| |
(2) | Financial sponsorships
| 11.10.2016
| |
5. | Overseas Visits
| 11.10.2016
| |
6. | Payments, benefits or advantages received from any government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" | ||
(1) | From any government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong
| 11.10.2016
| |
(2) | From any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident"
| 11.10.2016
| |
7. | Land and Property
| 11.10.2016*
| |
8. | Beneficial interests in shares of companies or other bodies
| 11.10.2016*
| |
9. | Miscellaneous
| 11.10.2016
23.12.2016 09.10.2018 25.06.2019 25.06.2019 30.05.2020 17.08.2020 01.04.2021 |